Vedic Maths is a gift given to this world by the ancient scholars of India. The name Vedic Maths is derived from a Sanskrit word ‘Veda’ which means ‘Knowledge’. It is a collection of techniques to solve maths problems in an easy and faster way. By Vedic methods, ‘difficult’ problems or long sums can be solved immediately. The simplicity of Vedic Mathematics means that calculations can be carried out mentally. It also lends a helping hand as you progress to higher classes because Vedic Maths always has a shorter way for solving quadratic and other polynomial functions and equations that one would encounter in higher classes.
Here, we will tell you 10 Vedic Maths tricks to solve your Maths problems with higher accuracy and in the least time. These tricks will help in reducing the dependency on calculators even for the bigger calculations. The importance of these trick is most realized in the exams where time is less and questions are more like IMO, SSC, JEE, Banking Exams, etc.
10 Vedic Maths Tricks
1. Squaring of a number ending with 5
In this Vedic Maths trick, you would learn how quickly squaring a twodigit number ending in 5.
2. Multiplying any number by 5
Most students memorize the 5 times tables very easily, but when you get into larger numbers it gets more complex – isn’t it? But don’t worry! This trick is super easy.
Take any number, then divide it by 2 (in other words, half the number). If the result is whole, add a 0 at the end. If it is not, ignore the remainder and add a 5 at the end. It works every time:
Buy the course now [button size=”medium” link=”https://bit.ly/3O6Bk8R” linkTarget=”_blank” color=”magenta”]Buy Now[/button] 
3. Subtraction from 1000, 10000, 100000, and so on.
This Vedic Maths Subtraction trick is very useful for getting instant subtraction result of any large number from 1000, 1000……so on. You just keep one formula – Subtract all from 9 and the last from 10.
4. Multiplication of any 2digit numbers, from 11 to 19
By using this trick, you can multiply any twodigit number from 11 to 19 quickly. No wonder if generously practiced, it can give result faster than calculator! Have a look on the 4 steps involved in it:
5. Dividing a large number by 5
This trick will get you result quickly of dividing a large digit number by 5. All you need to follow only two steps, in first step multiply the number by 2 while in second step move the decimal point.
6. Multiplication of a twodigit number by 11
With this trick, multiplication can be done in 1 or 2 seconds. So, let us see how using this method, calculation can be done in a matter of seconds.
7. Multiply any large number by 12
To multiply any number by 12 just double last digit and thereafter double each digit and add it to its neighbour.
For example 13243 * 12 = ?
Let’s break it into simple steps:
Step 1. 13243 * 12 = _____6 (Double of Last Digit 3= 6 )
Step 2. 13243 * 12 = ____16 (Now Double 4= 8, and add it to 3, 8+3=11, 1 will get carry over )
Step 3. 13243 * 12= ___916 (Now Double 2=4, and add it to 4 with carry, 4+4+1=9)
Step 4. 13243* 12= __8916 (Now Double 3=6, and add it to 2, 6+2=8)
Step 5. 13243 * 12= _58916 (Now Double 1=2, and add it to 3, 1+3=5)
Step 6. 13243 * 12= 158916 (Now Double 0=0, and add it to 1, 0+1=1)
So your final answer of 13243 * 12 = 158916
Now try…2431*12, 1256*12, 1964*12, 7236*12.
8. Multiplication of any 3digit numbers
Take any two numbers like 308 and 306 Now try…208*206, 508*504, 408*406. 

9. Convert kilograms to pounds quickly
If you want to convert kilograms to pounds, you can do it in your head in few seconds.
Let take an example: Convert 112 Kg to pound.
Step 1. Multiply Kg value by 2
112X2= 224
Step 2. Divide the previous one by 10
224/10=22.4
Step 3. Add both the number
224+ 22.4= 246.4 pounds.
10. Trick for finding any square:
Finding square of any number in Vedic maths is extremely easy. Just follow the given steps:
Step 1.Choose a base closer to the number whose square is to be found.
Step 2. Find the difference of the number from its base.
Step 3. Add the difference with the number.
Step 4. Multiply the result with the base.
Step 5. Add the product of the square of the difference with the result of the above point.
We hope you find these Vedic math tricks useful to solve math problems quickly. However, there are never enough tricks when it comes to Vedic math. If someone thinks that learning Vedic math is nothing special or extra then they need to think twice. However, people thinking they want their children to learn more amazing Vedic math tricks and tips should definitely check Vedic Mathematics Recorded Lectures by MTG.
In the Live Online Classes of Vedic Mathematics, experts of Vedic Mathematic used to help children out in Understanding these tricks. However, there are children who can’t align their own schedules with the timings of these classes. Thus, MTG brought a better way of learning these amazing math tricks and tips – Vedic Mathematics Recorded Lectures.
These will be unedited and exact replicas of the Vedic Mathematics Online classes, just their Recorded version, where there will be complete coverage. Along with these recorded lectures, you also get a set of 7 Vedic mathematics books. There will be 15 sessions of 1 hour each for the Level 1 course (classes 3, 4, and 5) and 20 sessions of 1 hour each for the Level 2 course (classes 6 and onwards). After each session, there will be a quiz of 10 questions to test what you have learned and how much you’ve grown. Students can even ask their doubts via the student portal.
However, the value addition in this course is a set of “7 Vedic Mathematics Books” with which children can practice countless questions and techniques. Each chapter explains the steps of a trick along with example questions following practice questions and answers keys.
Therefore, now children can learn at their own time, convenience, pace, and comfort without having to worry about the timings.
Help your children become masters of mathematics!
Realy this is very easy method which you show above.
Student will easyly learn and will be take interest in maths.
We were pioneers in maths and looks like during the british rule all the rules were re written .It is high time that our education system gets revamped with this kind in school to give our next generation students a cutting edge and since lot of people drop out due to not able to follow maths .
Thank you for sharing this important information